WSC EDUCATION OPPORTUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1138201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required