WSC EDUCATION OPPORTUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1138201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £378 £243 £73 £130 £95
Total expenditure £4.43k £1.27k £2.06k £210 £229
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A