WSC EDUCATION OPPORTUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1138201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Healey Pearce Trustee 27 June 2017 None on record
Peter Harbron Trustee 29 June 2020 None on record
Christina Mary Sadler Trustee 11 November 2019 None on record
STEPHEN JONES Chair 04 March 2013 None on record
David John Kent Trustee 09 March 2015 None on record