Dogfen lywodraethu HOPE'S CHILDREN & YOUNG PEOPLES SUPPORT SERVICES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/08/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/08/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/08/2012 as amended on 11 Nov 2017 as amended on 15 May 2018 as amended on 17 Dec 2020 as amended on 02 Aug 2022 as amended on 28 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) To relieve the mental and physical sickness of persons resident in the United Kingdom, in particular children and young people suffering from bereavement or loss or a serious health crisis of a family member by the provision of workshops and support. (2) To advance the education of professionals working with children and young people suffering from bereavement, loss or the serious illness of a family member by the provision of training.
Maes buddion
HEREFORDSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.