Accounts and annual returns NEW TESTAMENT CHRISTIAN MISSION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1136444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 09 June 2022 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 June 2022 435 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 18 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 14 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required