THE NEW MIKVEH

Charity number: 1138389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 June 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2019 23 December 2020 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2018 05 July 2019 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2016 19 June 2017 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2016 Not Required