THE NEW MIKVEH

Charity number: 1138389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/07/2016 30/07/2017 30/07/2018 30/07/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £373 £373 £373 £373 £373
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A