THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BOTOLPH-WITHOUT-BISHOPSGATE

Charity number: 1135985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £376.38k £354.59k £284.46k £391.33k £201.79k
Total expenditure £278.01k £360.42k £307.90k £411.20k £296.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A