Trustees NEW BEGINNING COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (MALABAR)
Charity number: 1137079
Charity reporting is overdue by 667 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Anthony Hall | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Goodman | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WELLS | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Stuart Roden | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Coon | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GAZZARD | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.