Trustees THE NEW ROOM/JOHN WESLEY'S CHAPEL

Charity number: 1137957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR John C Savage CBE Chair 01 September 2018
None on record
Rev Dr Jonathan Hustler Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
NIALL PHILLIPS Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Rev JOSETTE CRANE Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
GEOFFREY RICHARD GOLLOP OBE Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Linda Jones Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
AROONA SMITH MBE, DL Trustee 01 September 2014
SOUTH BRISTOL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MICHAEL ROSE Trustee 01 September 2014
NAILSEA METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Dr Jonathan Howard Pye Trustee
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SOMERSET
Received: On time
BRISTOL DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE LEONARD LAITY STOATE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
METHODIST INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
Eleanor Jane Allin Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
TAUNTON DEANE AND SOUTH SEDGEMOOR METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MUSGROVE LEUKAEMIC GROUP SOMERSET
Received: On time
GARY BEST Trustee
None on record
Rev DAVID WEEKS Trustee
None on record
Anthony Ward Jones Trustee
None on record