ABIKE ADE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 01 April 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 May 2020 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 23 January 2020 391 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 08 February 2018 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 05 May 2017 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required