ABIKE ADE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £16.43k £9.69k £9.35k £4.26k £3.71k
Total expenditure £16.92k £9.93k £8.71k £5.32k £4.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A