Financial history NORTH SHROPSHIRE COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1136523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.89k £9.76k £9.76k £12.58k £2.66k
Total expenditure £7.34k £7.39k £7.39k £6.61k £4.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A