Financial history ADONAI UK

Charity number: 1136724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £65.69k £62.63k £65.07k £62.00k £78.00k
Total expenditure £61.81k £64.94k £62.51k £61.46k £74.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A