"THE NATIVITY OF THE MOTHER OF GOD" ROMANIAN ORTHODOX TRUST

Charity number: 1139040
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/05/2016 04/05/2017 04/05/2018 04/05/2019 04/05/2020
Total gross income £14.05k £10.02k £15.03k £16.78k £17.01k
Total expenditure £14.86k £5.26k £5.17k £7.32k £11.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A