FAIR MONEY ADVICE

Charity number: 1138351
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 February 2019 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 March 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download