THE CAUGHLEY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1137851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Brian Thomas Trustee 10 April 2021 None on record
Timothy Morgan Dawes Trustee 10 April 2021 None on record
Oliver Cartwright Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
Thelma Smith Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
Ivor Neilson Smith Trustee 12 April 2014 None on record
SIMON RICHARD BAILEY Trustee 17 April 2013 None on record
David Mark Byrne Trustee 10 April 2021 None on record
Allan Smith Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
CHRIS RIDDLE Chair 03 November 2011
KEN THOMAS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
WADEBRIDGE PRIMESTOCK SHOW ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE ROYAL SMITHFIELD CLUB Received: On time
ROGER THORNHILL MA Trustee
ASH SCHOOL HOUSE CHARITY Received: On time