OASIS COMMUNITY HUB: NORTH BRISTOL

Charity number: 1136930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £32.57k £44.96k £152.10k £135.74k £150.88k
Total expenditure £28.20k £39.96k £81.42k £153.45k £131.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A