THE PRAEBENDO CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £44.05k £65.37k £294.45k £66.01k £24.51k
Total expenditure £374.46k £19.82k £12.38k £15.11k £66.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A