Financial history KICKSTART GHANA

Charity number: 1139399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.01k £28.76k £9.84k £5.24k £5.78k
Total expenditure £10.60k £28.43k £11.43k £5.00k £3.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A