AMEN CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1139323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 April 2020 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 24 April 2020 55 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 20 December 2019 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 20 December 2019 295 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 26 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 22 July 2017 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 22 July 2017 144 days late Download