AMEN CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1139323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £110.63k £93.51k £175.80k £178.98k £215.02k
Total expenditure £96.65k £101.51k £163.57k £188.00k £222.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A