BABA BUDHA JI EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1138700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £57.74k £62.63k £55.41k £84.58k £86.92k
Total expenditure £56.89k £47.25k £72.61k £73.60k £64.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £42.67k