Accounts and annual returns Horizons Education Trust

Charity number: 1136362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 February 2022 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 October 2020 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 October 2020 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 August 2019 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 August 2019 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window