Financial history THE NATIONAL PRO BONO CENTRE

Charity number: 1137708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £353.94k £403.26k £361.83k £326.83k £150.85k
Total expenditure £405.15k £390.30k £382.88k £314.10k £87.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A