ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF HOLLINGWORTH LAKE

Charity number: 1136889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/05/2016 30/05/2017 30/05/2018 30/05/2019 30/05/2020
Total gross income £6.48k £400 £4.26k £20.14k £2.99k
Total expenditure £4.87k £3.43k £4.06k £12.25k £11.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A