PAULINE MEREDITH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1139585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 11 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 11 March 2018 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2018 24 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 11 March 2017 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2017 09 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 11 March 2016 20 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2016 20 July 2016 On time Download