Dogfen lywodraethu DURHAM WILDLIFE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JULY 1971 AS AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 1980 AND 10 NOVEMBER 2008. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 SEP 2016 as amended on 18 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE: - FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN THE COUNTY OF DURHAM :- I) TO RECORD, STUDY AND PROTECT FROM INJURY, ILL-TREATMENT OR DESTRUCTION PLACES AND OBJECTS OF NATURAL BEAUTY OR OF BOTANICAL, ZOOLOGICAL, ECOLOGICAL, SILVICULTURAL, GEOLOGICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL, HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST. II) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE, CARRY ON AND ENCOURAGE STUDY AND RESEARCH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE NATURAL SCIENCES AND TO MAKE GRANTS OR DONATIONS FOR SUCH PURPOSES. III) TO ESTABLISHED, FORM, OWN, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SANCTUARIES AND RESERVES FOR THE PRESERVATION OF FAUNA AND VEGETATION AND AREAS OF NATURAL BEAUTY OR OF BOTANICAL, ZOOLOGICAL, ECOLOGICAL, SILVICULTURAL, GEOLOGICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL, HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST.
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF DURHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.