THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON

Charity number: 1136970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £589.47k £373.23k £281.61k £300.71k £265.94k
Total expenditure £438.05k £421.22k £418.31k £328.91k £227.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.56k £59.02k £10.10k N/A £11.94k
Income - Donations and legacies £536.77k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £21.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £29.01k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £430.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.76k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £650 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A