Trustees ALTRINCHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1137097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JANET ASPEY | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Christine Hynes | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Harwood | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
JACQUELINE RUTH GRIFFITH | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rosalinda Jean Fazackerley | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
David James Jolley | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
David Glenton Owen | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Susan Mary Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Hague | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
BERYL HUNWICK | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Lesley Entwistle | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rev IAN GOLDING | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Paul Winnington | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Janet Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Malcolm Aspey | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Fletcher Jaquiss | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MATTHEW DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Rachel Louise Foster | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JACQUELINE CLARE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SARAH HAGUE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SUSAN MARGARET WOODS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SIMON PETER BEALES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CHRISTINA GRACE MARY GREEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DOROTHY MARGARET BRETHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IAN PETER ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.