THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY BREDIN, CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1137431
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2021 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 March 2021 131 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 16 May 2016 On time Download