Financial history UK HOMES 4 HEROES PRIDE AND PASSION LTD

Charity number: 1138073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £67.84k £67.78k £86.94k £139.41k £133.85k
Total expenditure £77.62k £69.22k £85.84k £97.20k £100.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £3.50k £3.50k N/A