Trustees GUTS UK CHARITY
Charity number: 1137029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Victoria Ann King | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Conor McCann | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ravinder Chahil | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Leonard | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher Simon John Probert | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christine Norton | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Davey | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Bridge | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shaji Sebastian | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Dugdale-Bradley | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Adams | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Miranda Lomer | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.