Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1136986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prathu Prathu - | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Reynolds | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Joe Russell | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Carol Read-Pitt | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danial Amer Haq | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellena Leech | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Nuttall | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tu Anh Do | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Turner Ferris Woolley | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Noa Ellie Acker Holt | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel Avison Butterworth | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Ciaran Nolan | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Bridge | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.