Accounts and annual returns DARJEELING RAILWAY COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1137961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 January 2018 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required