Financial history DARJEELING RAILWAY COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1137961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.72k £5.45k £4.03k £4.04k £6.53k
Total expenditure £4.33k £4.10k £4.42k £10.48k £6.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A