Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS WITH ST MARY, STROOD

Charity number: 1138948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Susan Fiona Vallente-Kerr Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
Jade Abigail Goodwin Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
Yvonne Elizabeth Harris Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
Robert Martin James Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Ubi Casely-Hayford Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
William Childs Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Sarah Catherine Wilkinson Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
ROBERT LESLIE FOXWELL Trustee 29 July 2013
None on record
SUSAN MARRABLE B Ed Trustee 01 August 2012
None on record
Rev DAVID WILLIAM GREEN Trustee
COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (MEDWAY)
Received: On time
MR KEN REYNOLDS Trustee
None on record
ELAINE LESLEY FORD Trustee
None on record
MR JEFF WHITELEY Trustee
None on record