Financial history THE AFRICAN INSTITUTE FOR MATHEMATICAL SCIENCES - NEXT EINSTEIN INITIATIVE FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1138466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £8.33m £8.18m £10.15m £2.97m £2.42m
Total expenditure £8.79m £8.81m £10.43m £2.99m £2.52m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.32m £8.17m £10.14m £2.96m £2.42m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.07k £15.17k £9.83k £3.25k £2
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.79m £8.81m £10.43m £2.99m £2.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £68.93k £31.10k £40.34k £22.18k £21.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.34m £5.38m £7.86m £2.11m £2.40m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0