"WE THE CHANGE" FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137870
Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 574 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 574 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 940 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 940 days
Annual return 30 April 2017 19 June 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 29 June 2017 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required