Financial history THE HERON THEATRE

Charity number: 501134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 01/06/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £36.82k £37.55k £41.53k £36.81k £5.93k
Total expenditure £35.96k £36.89k £40.62k £29.85k £5.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 N/A N/A N/A N/A