KNOWLEDGE SCHOOLS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1138194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £91.15k £136.04k £135.92k £376.03k £130.49k
Total expenditure £97.96k £171.21k £132.54k £170.50k £120.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A