NEWCASTLE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1138091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 30/07/2017 29/07/2018 28/07/2019 28/07/2020
Total gross income £4.01m £3.80m £4.31m £4.05m £5.08m
Total expenditure £4.14m £3.98m £4.25m £4.24m £5.32m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £31.00k £10.00k N/A £23.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.95m £1.89m £2.43m £2.25m £2.34m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.06m £1.90m £1.88m £1.53m £2.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £257.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.14m £3.98m £4.25m £4.24m £5.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.00k £7.00k £6.00k £6.00k £8.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0