FACULTY OF OCCUPATIONAL MEDICINE

Charity number: 1139516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £928.01k £841.00k £987.38k £1.22m £1.19m
Total expenditure £936.20k £974.89k £960.15k £973.63k £984.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £898.91k £839.17k £982.97k £1.21m £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.09k £1.83k £1.41k £2.37k £2.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.00k £8.08k £10.81k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £936.20k £974.89k £960.15k £973.63k £984.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £102.45k £111.80k £55.92k £36.56k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0