FACULTY OF OCCUPATIONAL MEDICINE

Charity number: 1139516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Ira Madan Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Dr Carl Rikard Moen Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record
Karen Elizabeth Walker-Bone Professor Trustee 19 June 2020 None on record
Dr Yousef Habbab Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
Lynsey Helen Mann Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
Dr Steven Nimmo Trustee 12 April 2017 None on record
Dr Lisa Ann Curran Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
Professor Neil Budworth Trustee 25 March 2014 None on record