DINGLEY FAMILY AND SPECIALIST EARLY YEARS CENTRES

Charity number: 1137609
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)