Financial history ROALD DAHL'S MARVELLOUS CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1137409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.54m £1.21m £991.29k £891.47k £1.42m
Total expenditure £1.53m £1.72m £1.19m £1.22m £1.22m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.24m £1.15m £943.20k £768.58k £1.42m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £46.37k £46.89k £48.09k £29.14k £287
Income - Other £262.13k £12.24k £0 £93.74k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £100.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £876.98k £1.42m £964.93k £872.83k £913.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £381.19k £301.70k £228.20k £345.16k £305.79k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £178.23k £118.09k £122.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £269.15k -£9.32k £0 £4.68k £2.34k