Trustees ROALD DAHL'S MARVELLOUS CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1137409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR ALEX HYDE-PARKER Chair 01 March 2017
None on record
Rachelle Mary Broadley Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Benjamin Carlyle Grist Trustee 09 December 2019
None on record
Jodi Saron Ella Johnson Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
Robert David Halkyard Trustee 12 September 2018
None on record
Nicholas Warr Trustee 23 May 2018
None on record
Michelle Johnson Trustee 14 July 2015
None on record
Niels Kirk Trustee 14 July 2015
None on record