Trustees THE UNIV. OLD MEMBERS' TRUST
Charity number: 1137545
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Cummins | Chair | 22 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Graham Bell | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Sean Alexander Paul | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Khalid Siddique | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Graeme Proudfoot | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Captain Patrick Grant | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Williams | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amrita Jaijee | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Ian Grant | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Jon-Paul Spencer | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Annie Lee Man Tse | Trustee | 21 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr NICHOLAS PETER YEUNG | Trustee | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.