NATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR GIVING VOICE

Charity number: 1140266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £2.91k £2.20k £2.34k £1.88k £1.90k
Total expenditure £8.17k £5.52k £5.50k £6.08k £4.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A