THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN, GREENHILL, HARROW

Charity number: 1138108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 October 2016 On time Download